VA SB1006 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0719)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0719)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commitment hearings; sharing of records and information. Requires the Office of the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court to provide electronic data, including individually identifiable information, on proceedings pursuant to the Psychiatric Treatment of Minors Act and the Emergency Custody of Voluntary and Involuntary Civil Admissions Act to the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services upon request and provides that the Department may use such data for the purpose of developing and maintaining statistical archives, conducting research on the outcome of such proceedings, and preparing analyses and reports for use by the Department. The bill requires the Department to take all necessary steps to protect the security and privacy of the records and information provided pursuant to the provisions of the bill in accordance with the requirements of state and federal law and regulations governing health privacy. This bill is identical to HB 1551.
Title
Commitment hearings; sharing of records and information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0719) | |
2017-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 719 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1006ER) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1006S1 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104524D-S1 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104524D-S1 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101414D |