VA SB1004 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Advance estimate of patient payment amount for elective medical procedure, test, or service; notice of right to request. Provides that every hospital currently required to provide an estimate of the payment amount for an elective procedure, test, or service for which a patient may be responsible shall also be required to provide each patient with written information regarding his right to request such estimate, to post written information regarding a patient's right to request such estimate conspicuously in public areas of the hospital, and to make such information available on the hospital's website. Advance estimate of patient payment amount for elective medical procedure, test, or service; notice of right to request. Provides that every hospital currently required to provide an estimate of the payment amount for an elective procedure, test, or service for which a patient may be responsible shall also be required to provide each patient with written information regarding his right to request such estimate, to post written information regarding a patient's right to request such estimate conspicuously in public areas of the hospital, and to make such information available on the hospital's website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elective procedure, test, or service; estimate of payment amount.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (4-Y 36-N) (Y: 4 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1004ER)
2019-03-07SenateEnrolled
2019-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Aird, Stolle, Garrett
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-20SenateSenators: Chase, Suetterlein, Lucas
2019-02-20SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-20SenateSenate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseHouse requested conference committee
2019-02-19HouseHouse insisted on amendments
2019-02-18SenateHouse amendments rejected by Senate (4-Y 36-N)
2019-02-14HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14HousePassed House with amendments (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2019-02-14HouseAmendments by Delegate Orrock agreed to
2019-02-14HouseCommittee amendments rejected
2019-02-14HouseRead third time
2019-02-13HousePassed by for the day
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-12HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (14-Y 8-N)
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-02-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1004S1
2019-01-28SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19104197D-S1
2019-01-28SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-28SenateRead second time
2019-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
2019-01-24SenateCommittee substitute printed 19104197D-S1
2019-01-24SenateIncorporates SB1357 (Wagner)
2019-01-24SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2018-07-16SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-07-16SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100070D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321137.05(n/a)See Bill Text
5412973.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1004
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1004+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1004S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1004ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0102+SB1004
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0196SB1004+SB1004
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0221SB1004+SB1004
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0142+SB1004
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2816+SB1004
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0737SB1004+SB1004
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0888SB1004+SB1004
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1068SB1004+SB1004
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3341+SB1004

Bill Comments

feedback