VA SB1003 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0022)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0022)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Wireless E-911 Fund; distribution percentages. Postpones from July 1, 2017, to July 1, 2018, the date by which the Department of Taxation is required to conduct its first recalculation of the percentage of funds in the Wireless E-911 Fund that is required to be distributed to each public safety answering point (PSAP). The recalculation is required to be based on the cost and call load data of each PSAP for the previous five fiscal years. This bill is identical to HB 1719.
Title
Wireless E-911 Fund; distribution percentages.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0022) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 22 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2017 | |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/14/17 |
2017-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1003ER) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-07 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102202D |