VA SB1002 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0435)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0435)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local workforce investment boards; pay-for-performance incentives. Encourages local workforce investment boards to implement pay-for-performance contract strategy incentives for training services as an alternative model to traditional programs. The bill also authorizes local workforce investment boards to allocate funds to the extent permissible under §§ 128(b) and 133(b) of the Workforce Innovation and Opportunity Act of 2014 (P.L. 113-128) for pay-for-performance partnerships.
Title
Local workforce investment boards; pay-for-performance contract strategy incentives.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0435) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 435 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/4/15 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1002ER) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Title replaced 15105236D-H1 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1002H1 |
2015-02-23 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15105236D-H1 |
2015-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105236D-H1 |
2015-02-19 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103403D |