VA SB1001 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0679)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0679)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sale and procurement of certain pets. Prohibits the sale or display of a dog or cat on or in a roadside, parking lot, flea market, or similar place, with certain exceptions. The bill limits the sources of pet shop dogs to humane societies, public or private animal shelters, and those who meet certain qualifications and establishes a recordkeeping requirement for pet shops selling dogs. The bill also applies the existing misdemeanor penalty for a violation of the section to each dog sold or offered for sale.
Title
Dogs or cats; sell, exchange, etc., prohibited on or in any roadside, parkway, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 15-N) (Y: 84 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 15-N) (Y: 84 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0679) | |
2015-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 679 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1001ER) |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Title replaced 15105143D-H1 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 15-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Passed House with substitute with amendment (82-Y 15-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment SB1001H1 |
2015-02-24 | House | Amendment by Delegate Wilt agreed to |
2015-02-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15105143D-H1 |
2015-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-18 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105143D-H1 |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (17-Y 5-N) |
2015-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Agriculture |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1001S1 |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104104D-S1 |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104104D-S1 |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101860D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 6508.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6511.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6517.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |