VA HR9 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-9)
Status: Passed on February 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-14 - Bill text as passed House (HR9ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-9)
Status: Passed on February 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-14 - Bill text as passed House (HR9ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Falun Gong; Persecution by Chinese Communist Party. Condemns the persecution of Falun Gong practitioners by the Chinese Communist Party.
Title
Falun Gong; persecution by Chinese Communist Party.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (82-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House (HR9ER) |
2022-02-11 | House | VOTE: Adoption (82-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-02-11 | House | Agreed to by House (82-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-02-11 | House | Engrossed by House |
2022-02-11 | House | Taken up |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22103606D |