VA HR69 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-11 - House: Agreed to by House by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-11 - House: Agreed to by House by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Tommy Garner.
Title
Commending Tommy Garner.
Sponsors
Del. Robin Abbott [D] | Del. Mamye BaCote [D] | Del. Glenn Oder [R] | Del. Brenda Pogge [R] |
Del. Jeion Ward [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-11 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2011-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2011-02-08 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 11104304D | |
2011-02-04 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 11104304D | |
2011-01-11 | House: Bill text as passed House (HR69ER) |