VA HR140 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Rules of the House of Delegates, pertaining to the voting requirement to discharge a committee from the consideration of a resolution.
Title
House of Delegates; amending and readopting Rule 81.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Failed to pass in House |
2020-03-12 | House | No further action taken |
2020-03-08 | House | Passed by until Friday, March 13, 2020 |
2020-02-28 | House | Presented, ordered printed and laid on Speaker's table 20109384D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HR140 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HR140+hil |