VA HR135 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - Bill text as passed House (HR135ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending the 2024 Inductees to the Virginia Sports Hall of Fame.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending the 2024 Inductees to the Virginia Sports Hall of Fame.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-19HouseBill text as passed House (HR135ER)
2024-02-19HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2024-02-19HouseEngrossed by House
2024-02-14HousePresented and laid on Speaker's table 24104052D

Same As/Similar To

SJR130 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ130ER)
SR84 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Bill text as passed Senate (SR84ER)

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback