VA HJR967 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-25 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-25 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Maria J. K. Everett.
Title
Commending Maria J. K. Everett.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-25 | House | Failed to pass in House |
2017-02-25 | House | No further action taken |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed by until Sunday, February 26, 2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 17102009D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HJ967 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HJ967+hil |