VA HJR962 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-25 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ962ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-25 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ962ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Mantua Elementary School on the occasion of its 50th anniversary.
Title
Commending Mantua Elementary School on the occasion of its 50th anniversary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ962ER) | |
2011-02-25 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2011-02-24 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 11105494D | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Received | |
2011-02-23 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2011-02-23 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2011-02-21 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 11105494D |