VA HJR9 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - VOTE: REJECTED (29-Y 67-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - VOTE: REJECTED (29-Y 67-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
U.S. Constitution; application for a convention of the states. Applies to Congress to call a convention of the states to propose amendments to the United States Constitution to restrain the abuse of power by the federal government.
Title
United States Constitution; application for a convention of the states.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (29-Y 67-N) (Y: 30 N: 68 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (29-Y 67-N) |
2014-02-06 | House | Rejected by House (29-Y 67-N) |
2014-02-06 | House | Pending question ordered |
2014-02-06 | House | Taken up |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules (9-Y 6-N) |
2013-12-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-12-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100295D |