VA HJR89 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; economic and environmental impacts of litter on fishing, farming, habitat, organisms, and water quality in streams; report. Requests the Department of Environmental Quality to study the economic and environmental impacts of litter on fishing, farming, water quality, and other components of Virginia's economy and habitat and to propose strategies, campaigns, and necessary state actions to protect the economy of the Commonwealth from harm caused by litter and to promote Virginia's economic welfare.
Title
Litter; DEQ to study impacts on fishing, etc., in Virginia's streams.
Sponsors
Del. Paul Krizek [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Rules (12-Y 5-N) (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 1-N) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 1-N) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Rules (12-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105044D |