VA HJR869 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - Agreed to by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - Agreed to by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Anthony Pearly Tucker, Jr.
Title
Celebrating the life of Anthony Pearly Tucker, Jr.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Glenn Davis [R] |
Del. Matt Fariss [R] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Chris Jones [R] | Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Del. Barry Knight [R] | Del. Steven Landes [R] | Del. James Leftwich [R] | Del. Michael Mullin [D] |
Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Received |
2017-02-10 | House | Agreed to by House |
2017-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House |
2017-02-02 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 17105049D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HJ869 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HJ869+hil |