VA HJR844 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ844ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ844ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Lloyd C. Bird High School football team.
Title
Commending the Lloyd C. Bird High School football team.
Sponsors
Del. Kirkland Cox [R] | Del. Riley Ingram [R] | Del. George Loupassi [R] | Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Roxann Robinson [R] | Del. Joseph Preston [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ844ER) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Received |
2015-02-20 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2015-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House |
2015-02-16 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 15104009D |