VA HJR843 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-10 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ843ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-10 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ843ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Roberta Lee Tyner Naranjo.
Title
Celebrating the life of Roberta Lee Tyner Naranjo.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ843ER) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Received |
2017-02-03 | House | Agreed to by House |
2017-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House |
2017-01-27 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 17104609D |