VA HJR840 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ840ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ840ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of John Early McDonald, Jr.
Title
Celebrating the life of John Early McDonald, Jr.
Sponsors
Del. Steven Landes [R] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Sen. Lionell Spruill [D] | Del. Roslyn Tyler [D] |
Del. Lee Ware [R] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] |
Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Michael Futrell [D] |
Del. Dave LaRock [R] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ840ER) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Received |
2015-02-20 | House | Agreed to by House |
2015-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House |
2015-02-16 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 15103335D |