VA HJR84 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Department of Education; root causes of public school bus driver shortages and working conditions of public school bus drivers in the Commonwealth; report. Requests that the Department of Education, with the assistance of each local school board, to study the root causes of public school bus driver shortages and the working conditions of public school bus drivers in the Commonwealth by (i) administering to each public school bus driver in each local school division in the Commonwealth and as many former public school bus drivers as is feasible a survey to determine the level of satisfaction with and the need for improvement to the working conditions of public school bus drivers in the Commonwealth, (ii) analyzing such survey data and such other information and data as it deems necessary and advisable, including information from other states and school districts contained therein that have had success in addressing public school bus driver shortages by addressing working conditions, and (iii) making recommendations for statutory, regulatory, or budgetary changes that may contribute to the improvement of the working conditions of public school bus drivers.
Title
Public school bus drivers; Department of Education to study root causes of shortages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103844D |