VA HJR828 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ828ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ828ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Jim Bullington.
Title
Celebrating the life of Jim Bullington.
Sponsors
Del. Steven Landes [R] | Sen. Joseph Morrissey [D] | Del. Roslyn Tyler [D] | Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Del. Vivian Watts [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Gregory Habeeb [R] | Del. Terry Austin [R] | Del. Dave LaRock [R] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Richard Sullivan [D] | Sen. Todd Pillion [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ828ER) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Received |
2015-02-20 | House | Agreed to by House |
2015-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House |
2015-02-13 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 15104810D |