VA HJR82 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority to study the emergence and integration of blockchain technology in the economy of the Commonwealth; report. Requests the Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority to identify blockchain technology research and economic development opportunities with the goal of creating a statewide, comprehensive, and coordinated strategy relating to blockchain technology. In conducting its study, the Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority shall analyze and consider (i) economic development opportunities in the Commonwealth available through the utilization of blockchain technology; (ii) different types of blockchain technology and the feasibility of economic development for each type; (iii) the creation of a statewide, comprehensive, and coordinated strategy to encourage commercial activity in the blockchain technology sector; (iv) opportunities for deployment of blockchain technology in state government; and (v) strategies to incentivize the development of blockchain companies in the Commonwealth. The Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority shall submit its report to the Governor and the 2021 and 2022 Regular Sessions of the General Assembly.
Title
Blockchain technology; VEDPA to study the emergence, etc., in the economy.
Sponsors
Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Lee Carter [D] | Del. Glenn Davis [R] |
Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104566D |