VA HJR804 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ804ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ804ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Appointments by the Speaker of the House of Delegates. Confirms appointments to certain boards made by the Speaker of the House of Delegates.
Title
Speaker of the House of Delegates; confirming appointments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ804ER) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Rules (11-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reading waived |
2015-02-17 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2015-02-17 | House | Agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2015-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House |
2015-02-17 | House | Taken up |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-02-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15100008D |