VA HJR797 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ797ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ797ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Day of Honor for the Marquis de Lafayette. Designates March 14, in 2015 and in each succeeding year, as a Day of Honor for the Marquis de Lafayette.
Title
Day of Honor for the Marquis de Lafayette; designating as March 14, 2015, and each year thereafter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ797ER) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reading waived |
2015-02-17 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House |
2015-02-17 | House | Taken up |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-02-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15104877D |
2015-02-10 | House | Unanimous consent to introduce |