VA HJR79 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; JLARC; special education staffing ratios; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to include in its current review of the effectiveness of Virginia's special education programs an examination of the prescribed and actual ratios of students to special education instructional and support personnel in public elementary and secondary schools in the Commonwealth to determine whether any adjustment to such ratios is necessary.
Title
Special education staffing ratios; JLARC to study.
Sponsors
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] | Del. Rodney Willett [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Rules |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102103D |