VA HJR783 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on February 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-15 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ783ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on February 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-15 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ783ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
National Speech and Debate Education Day. Designates March 3, in 2018 and in each succeeding year, as National Speech and Debate Education Day in Virginia.
Title
National Speech and Debate Education Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Rules (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Rules (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ783ER) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reading waived |
2017-01-31 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House |
2017-01-31 | House | Taken up |
2017-01-26 | House | Reported from Rules (12-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103709D |