VA HJR772 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HJR772

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-16)
Status: Passed on February 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-11 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ772ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Celebrating the life of Michael Wayne Woods.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Celebrating the life of Michael Wayne Woods.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-11HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HJ772ER)
2021-02-11SenateAgreed to by Senate
2021-02-11SenateTaken up for immediate consideration
2021-02-11SenateDischarged from Rules
2021-02-11SenateRules suspended (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules
2021-02-05SenateRereferred to Rules
2021-02-05SenateMotion to rerefer to committee agreed to
2021-02-05SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2021-02-05SenateReceived
2021-02-04HouseAgreed to by House
2021-02-04HouseEngrossed by House
2021-02-04HouseTaken up for immediate consideration
2021-02-02HousePresented and laid on Speaker's table 21104166D

Same As/Similar To

HJR772 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback