VA HJR767 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-15 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ767ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-15 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ767ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Confirming appointment of the Director of the Division of Legislative Services. Confirms the appointment by the House and Senate Committees on Rules of Mark J. Vucci as Director of the Division of Legislative Services.
Title
Confirming appointment of the Director of the Division of Legislative Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ767ER) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reading waived |
2017-01-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House |
2017-01-24 | House | Taken up |
2017-01-19 | House | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103332D |