VA HJR762 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ762ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ762ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Voices for Virginia's Children.
Title
Commending Voices for Virginia's Children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ762ER) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Received |
2019-02-04 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House |
2019-01-29 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 19104446D |