VA HJR760 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ760ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ760ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the George Washington University School of Nursing.
Title
Commending the George Washington University School of Nursing.
Sponsors
Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] |
Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] | Del. Richard Sullivan [D] | Del. Roslyn Tyler [D] | Del. Jeion Ward [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ760ER) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Received |
2019-02-04 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House |
2019-01-28 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 19104767D |