VA HJR76 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ76ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ76ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Women Veterans Week. Designates the third full week of March, in 2018 and in each succeeding year, as Women Veterans Week in Virginia. The resolution is identical to SJ 36.
Title
Women Veterans Week; designating as third full week of March 2018, and each succeeding year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION #2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION #2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ76ER) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reading waived |
2018-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION #2 (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2018-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Printed as engrossed 18103757D-E |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HJ76E |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-12 | House | Taken up |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103757D |