VA HJR751 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Richard A. Cordle.
Title
Commending Richard A. Cordle.
Sponsors
Del. Kirkland Cox [R] | Sen. Lashrecse Aird [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Riley Ingram [R] |
Del. George Loupassi [R] | Del. Roxann Robinson [R] | Del. Lee Ware [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Received |
2017-01-20 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2017-01-20 | House | Engrossed by House |
2017-01-16 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 17102789D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HJ751 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HJ751+hil |