VA HJR749 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Sterling N. Ransone, Jr., M.D.
Title
Commending Sterling N. Ransone, Jr., M.D.
Sponsors
Del. John O'Bannon [R] | Del. Christopher Peace [R] | Del. Christopher Stolle [R] | Del. Scott Garrett [R] |
Del. Keith Hodges [R] | Del. Margaret Ransone [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Received |
2015-02-06 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2015-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House |
2015-02-04 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 15104480D |