VA HJR748 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ748ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending Virginia State University.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending Virginia State University.

Sponsors

Del. Lashrecse Aird [D]Del. Larry Rush [R]Del. Dawn Adams [D]Del. Les Adams [R]
Del. Terry Austin [R]Del. Hala Ayala [D]Del. Lamont Bagby [D]Del. John Bell [D]
Del. Richard Bell [R]Del. Robert Bell [R]Del. Robert Bloxom [R]Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D]
Del. Emily Brewer [R]Del. David Bulova [D]Del. Kathy Byron [R]Del. Jeffrey Campbell [R]
Del. Ronnie Campbell [R]Del. Betsy Carr [D]Del. Jennifer Foy [D]Del. Lee Carter [D]
Del. Christopher Collins [R]Del. Kelly Convirs-Fowler [D]Del. Kirkland Cox [R]Del. Glenn Davis [R]
Del. Karrie Delaney [D]Del. James Edmunds [R]Del. Matt Fariss [R]Del. Eileen Filler-Corn [D]
Del. Hyland Fowler [R]Del. Nicholas Freitas [R]Del. Scott Garrett [R]Del. Todd Gilbert [R]
Del. Wendy Gooditis [D]Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D]Del. C.E. Hayes [D]Del. Chris Head [R]
Del. Gordon Helsel [R]Del. Steve Heretick [D]Del. Keith Hodges [R]Del. Patrick Hope [D]
Del. Timothy Hugo [R]Del. Chris Hurst [D]Del. Riley Ingram [R]Del. Matthew James [D]
Del. Chris Jones [R]Del. Mark Keam [D]Del. Terry Kilgore [R]Del. Barry Knight [R]
Del. Kaye Kory [D]Del. Paul Krizek [D]Del. Steven Landes [R]Del. Dave LaRock [R]
Del. James Leftwich [R]Del. Mark Levine [D]Del. Joesph Lindsey [D]Del. Alfonso Lopez [D]
Del. Daniel Marshall [R]Del. John McGuire [R]Del. Joseph McNamara [R]Del. Delores McQuinn [D]
Del. Jason Miyares [R]Del. James Morefield [R]Del. Michael Mullin [D]Del. Kathleen Murphy [D]
Del. Israel O'Quinn [R]Del. Robert Orrock [R]Del. Christopher Peace [R]Del. Todd Pillion [R]
Del. Kenneth Plum [D]Del. Brenda Pogge [R]Del. Charles Poindexter [R]Del. Marcia Price [D]
Del. Margaret Ransone [R]Del. David Reid [D]Del. Roxann Robinson [R]Del. Debra Rodman [D]
Del. Danica Roem [D]Del. Mark Sickles [D]Del. Marcus Simon [D]Del. Christopher Stolle [R]
Del. Richard Sullivan [D]Del. Robert Thomas [R]Del. David Toscano [D]Del. Cheryl Turpin [D]
Del. Roslyn Tyler [D]Del. Schuyler VanValkenburg [D]Del. Lee Ware [R]Del. Vivian Watts [D]
Del. Michael Webert [R]Del. Tony Wilt [R]Del. Thomas Wright [R]Del. David Yancey [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HJ748ER)
2019-02-07SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2019-01-29SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2019-01-29SenateReceived
2019-01-28HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2019-01-28HouseEngrossed by House
2019-01-24HousePresented and laid on Speaker's table 19100336D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback