VA HJR744 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-15 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ744ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-15 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ744ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
World Voice Day. Designates April 16, in 2018 and in each succeeding year, as World Voice Day in Virginia.
Title
World Voice Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ744ER) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reading waived |
2017-01-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House |
2017-01-24 | House | Taken up |
2017-01-19 | House | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-01-13 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103349D |