VA HJR743 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ743ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending the Honorable Robert W. Goodlatte.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending the Honorable Robert W. Goodlatte.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HJ743ER)
2019-01-31SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2019-01-31SenateTaken up for immediate consideration
2019-01-31SenateRules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2019-01-31SenateReceived
2019-01-30HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2019-01-30HouseEngrossed by House
2019-01-30HouseTaken up for immediate consideration
2019-01-29HouseIntroduced bill reprinted 19103992D
2019-01-28HousePassed by for the day
2019-01-24HousePresented and laid on Speaker's table 19103992D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback