VA HJR724 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Pat Manuel.
Title
Commending Pat Manuel.
Sponsors
Del. Kirkland Cox [R] | Del. Riley Ingram [R] | Del. George Loupassi [R] | Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Roxann Robinson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Received |
2015-02-06 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2015-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House |
2015-01-30 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 15101446D |