VA HJR716 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-8)
Status: Passed on February 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ716ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending the Honorable Daun Sessoms Hester.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending the Honorable Daun Sessoms Hester.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HJ716ER)
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-20SenateAgreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
2019-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-20SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-20SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateReading waived (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateReported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-01-22SenateReading waived
2019-01-21HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2019-01-21HouseEngrossed by House
2019-01-21HouseTaken up for immediate consideration
2019-01-15HousePresented and laid on Speaker's table 19100782D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback