VA HJR712 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ712ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ712ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of the Honorable Frederick MacDonald Quayle.
Title
Celebrating the life of the Honorable Frederick MacDonald Quayle.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ712ER) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Received |
2019-01-21 | House | Agreed to by House |
2019-01-21 | House | Engrossed by House |
2019-01-14 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 19101711D |