VA HJR699 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-13 - Agreed to by House by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-13 - Agreed to by House by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Arthur A. Kirk, M.D.
Title
Commending Arthur A. Kirk, M.D.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-13 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2015-02-13 | House | Stricken from House calendar |
2015-01-30 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-23 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-21 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 15101137D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HJ699 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HJ699+hil |