VA HJR693 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Department of Education; impediments to gathering information about certain students with disabilities; report. Requests the Department of Education to study the existing impediments to gathering information about disabilities for which a student would not qualify for an Individualized Education Program or Section 504 Plan.
Title
Education, Department of; impediments to gathering information about certain students.
Sponsors
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] |
Del. Chris Hurst [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Rules |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-09 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19104410D |