VA HJR688 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ688ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ688ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; JLARC to update report on the implementation of the Workforce Investment Act; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to update its 2003 review of workforce training in Virginia. The Commission is requested to examine the level of transparency of funding of workforce training and development programs and recommend measures to ensure access to information regarding expenditures and the outcomes generated by such expenditures. The Commission shall report to the Governor and the 2015 Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Workforce Investment Act; JLARC to update its 2003 report on State's implementation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ688ER) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived |
2013-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ688H1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104664D-H1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Taken up |
2013-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104664D-H1 |
2013-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-16 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102847D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC)
Labor and Employment
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC)
Labor and Employment
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports