VA HJR686 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-4)
Status: Passed on January 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-23 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ686ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-4)
Status: Passed on January 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-23 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ686ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Arlington County Fire Department Station 8.
Title
Commending Arlington County Fire Department Station 8.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ686ER) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Taken up for immediate consideration |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Received |
2019-01-14 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2019-01-14 | House | Engrossed by House |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/09/19 19103499D |