VA HJR684 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-13 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ684ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-13 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ684ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Robert C. Vaughan III.
Title
Commending Robert C. Vaughan III.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ684ER) |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Received |
2017-01-11 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2017-01-11 | House | Engrossed by House |
2017-01-11 | House | Taken up for immediate consideration |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/11/17 17103806D |