VA HJR683 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-01 - Failed to report (defeated) in Privileges and Elections (11-Y 11-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-01 - Failed to report (defeated) in Privileges and Elections (11-Y 11-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first resolution); Transportation Funds. Requires the General Assembly to maintain permanent and separate Transportation Funds to include the Commonwealth Transportation Fund, Transportation Trust Fund, Highway Maintenance and Operating Fund, and other funds established by general law for transportation. The amendment directs that revenues dedicated to Transportation Funds on January 1, 2020, by general law, other than a general appropriation law, shall be deposited to the Transportation Funds, unless the General Assembly by general law, other than a general appropriation law, alters the revenues dedicated to the Transportation Funds. The amendment limits the use of Transportation Funds moneys to transportation and related purposes. The amendment specifies that the General Assembly may borrow from the Transportation Funds for other purposes only by a vote of two-thirds of the members elected to each house and that the loan must be repaid with reasonable interest within four years.
Title
Constitutional amendment; Transportation Funds (first reference).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-01 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Privileges and Elections (11-Y 11-N) (Y: 11 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | House | Failed to report (defeated) in Privileges and Elections (11-Y 11-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-12 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100216D |