VA HJR680 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Passed on February 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-23 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ680ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Passed on February 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-23 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ680ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the life and legacy of Reuben E. Lawson.
Title
Commemorating the life and legacy of Reuben E. Lawson.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ680ER) |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Received |
2023-02-20 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2023-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House |
2023-02-14 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 23104673D |