VA HJR67 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]


Commemorating the life and legacy of Sergeant Clinton Greaves, USA, Ret.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Commemorating the life and legacy of Sergeant Clinton Greaves, USA, Ret.


Roll Calls

2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2018-03-05SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2018-03-05SenateRead third time
2018-03-02SenateReading waived (38-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28SenateReported from Rules by voice vote
2018-01-15SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2018-01-15SenateReading waived
2018-01-12HouseAgreed to by House
2018-01-12HouseEngrossed by House
2018-01-08HousePrefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/10/18 18103903D

Virginia State Sources

Bill Comments