VA HJR669 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on January 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-20 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ669ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on January 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-20 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ669ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Phyllis Anderson Blevins.
Title
Celebrating the life of Phyllis Anderson Blevins.
Sponsors
Del. Israel O'Quinn [R] | Sen. John Bell [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Kathy Byron [R] |
Del. Jeffrey Campbell [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Daun Hester [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] | Del. Michael Mullin [D] | Sen. Todd Pillion [R] |
Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ669ER) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Received |
2017-01-13 | House | Agreed to by House |
2017-01-13 | House | Engrossed by House |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/11/17 17101341D |