VA HJR644 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-16 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ644ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending the Fredericksburg Regional Food Bank.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending the Fredericksburg Regional Food Bank.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-16HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HJ644ER)
2023-02-16SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2023-02-14SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2023-02-14SenateReceived
2023-02-13HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2023-02-13HouseEngrossed by House
2023-02-09HousePresented and laid on Speaker's table 23104522D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback