VA HJR634 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-04 - Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-04 - Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Western Fairfax Christian Ministries.
Title
Commending Western Fairfax Christian Ministries.
Sponsors
Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Dan Helmer [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Received |
2021-02-01 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2021-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House |
2021-01-28 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 21102576D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HJ634 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HJ634+hil |