VA HJR631 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on January 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-27 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ631ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on January 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-27 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ631ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Peter Allen Lewis.
Title
Commending Peter Allen Lewis.
Sponsors
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Sen. John Bell [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Steve Heretick [D] | Del. Daun Hester [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] | Del. Michael Mullin [D] |
Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Luke Torian [D] | Del. Roslyn Tyler [D] |
Del. Lee Ware [R] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ631ER) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Received |
2017-01-13 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2017-01-13 | House | Engrossed by House |
2017-01-09 | House | Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/11/17 17100977D |