VA HJR614 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-30 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ614ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-30 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ614ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Tara Worley.
Title
Commending Tara Worley.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-30 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ614ER) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Received |
2015-01-23 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2015-01-23 | House | Engrossed by House |
2015-01-16 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/14/15 15101682D |